FRIENDS OF CONYERS SCHOOL

Charity number: 512238
Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Activities which support the school and advance the education of students attending it. Fund raising.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Stockton-on-tees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CONYERS SCHOOL YARM PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARIANNA WILLIAMS Chair
None on record
Gillian Waller Trustee 14 September 2014
None on record
Helen Dodds Trustee 11 September 2014
None on record
Brenda Oxlee Trustee 11 September 2014
None on record
Michelle Drummond Trustee 11 September 2014
None on record
CAROL DUNN Trustee
LEVENDALE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
MRS L SPELLMAN Trustee
None on record
CHRIS AITKIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £3.06k £1.60k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.83k £1.37k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 March 2022 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 March 2022 499 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Conyers School
Green Lane
Yarm
TS15 9ET
Phone:
01642783253
Website:

No information available