HENLEY ROWING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in recreation, in particular by the provision of facilities for rowing and sculling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 16 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucinda Cave | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Leslie Friend | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Clarke | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francis Goodwin | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Edward Charles Mead | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARRY REDMAN | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HALL | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN TURNELL | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.15k | £197.50k | £209.58k | £235.53k | £403.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.52k | £175.67k | £175.01k | £251.42k | £352.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £15.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ROWING, SCULLING AND OTHER SPORTS ("FACILITIES" MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); AND PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Henley Rowing Club
Wargrave Road
Henley
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 3JD
- Phone:
- 01491573943
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window