LAMBERT LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of those in need by reason of ill-health or disability by providing or assisting in the provision of facilities , support services and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 July 2018: CIO registration
- LAMBERT LEAGUE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH WALLER | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Jaynee Thackray | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|||||
QUEENIE PATRICIA DOWSON | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.78k | £1.14k | £69.85k | £159 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £460 | £140.01k | £500 | £68.53k | £168.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 151 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHESNEY VILLA
THORNTON LE STREET
THIRSK
YO7 4DS
- Phone:
- 01845522677
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window