THE ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL, HIGH WYCOMBE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1179234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

(1) for the advancement of education through supporting the charitable purposes of Wycombe Royal Grammar School including but not limited to the provision of boarding accommodation for existing pupils; and/or (2) to promote the education of present and former pupils of Wycombe Royal Grammar School who are in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 2018: CIO registration
  • 26 January 2022: Funds received from 310627-1 YOUENS V C MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
  • 26 January 2022: Funds received from 310627-2 MCMANUS-RUSSELL AWARDS
  • 26 January 2022: Funds received from 310627-3 THE SOCIAL PROJECT PRIZE TRUST
  • 26 January 2022: Funds received from 310627-5 PATTISON AWARD
  • 26 January 2022: Funds received from 310627-4 JOHN COOPER AWARD FUND
  • 26 January 2022: Funds received from 310627-6 MANN MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIPS
  • 26 January 2022: Funds received from 310627 WYCOMBE ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • WYCOMBE ROYAL GRAMMAR FOUNDATION CIO (Previous name)
  • WYCOMBE ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION CIO (Previous name)
  • WYCOMBE ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION CIO (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger William Bayly Chair 29 January 2024
None on record
STEPHEN DAVID ASHTON Trustee 31 October 2022
None on record
Benedict Casemore Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
SONIA MODRAY Trustee 17 July 2018
None on record
IMRAN SHAZAD AFZAL Trustee 17 July 2018
None on record
MICHELE ELIZABETH JENNINGS Trustee 17 July 2018
None on record
PHILIP Brian WAYNE Trustee 17 July 2018
None on record
STEPHEN BILL DUNCOMBE Trustee 17 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.97m £460.51k £569.40k £816.90k £791.22k
Total expenditure £617.64k £523.21k £483.01k £1.62m £1.14m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £344.13k N/A £265.19k £502.10k £461.33k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £240.00k N/A £265.00k £265.00k £265.00k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.89k N/A £39.21k £49.80k £64.89k
Income - Other £1.36m N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £616.39k N/A £465.50k £1.60m £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.25k N/A £17.51k £15.90k £41.69k
Expenditure - Governance £9.00k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £313.40k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £273 N/A £9.28k £7.70k £8.09k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £8.25m N/A £7.90m £7.72m £7.54m
Long-term investments £598.61k N/A £627.69k £630.48k £620.00k
Other assets £1.98m N/A £2.06m £1.54m £974.67k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.18m N/A £911.83k £1.02m £618.38k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL
AMERSHAM ROAD
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP13 6QT
Phone:
01494551416
Email:
amj@rgshw.com
Website:

No information available