Financial history KEN DODD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.89m £459.55k £556.77k £539.71k £626.37k
Total expenditure £851.94k £570.81k £526.76k £543.27k £551.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.50m N/A £100.00k £1.31k £127.86k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £4.20k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £390.62k N/A £452.57k £500.90k £498.51k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £37.50k £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £810.00k N/A £469.36k £485.52k £494.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.38k N/A £57.40k £57.73k £56.97k
Expenditure - Governance £3.36k N/A £3.36k £3.36k £4.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £466.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £38.02k N/A £57.40k £57.73k £56.97k
Expenditure - Other £561 N/A £1 £22 £0