CAPITAL OF CYCLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to encourage more people to cycle, more often for utility and leisure. We develop the capacity of deprived communities to engage with cycling activities. We believe the environmental, social, mental and physical health, community and economic benefits of cycling are huge and collaborating with and supporting cycling related campaigns, clubs and community groups helps us to realise these.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £21,279 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ADAM TASKER | Chair | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jaeesha Ali | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imran Hussain | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Lynnette Evans | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.43k | £190.88k | £121.73k | £195.32k | £228.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.66k | £108.10k | £137.56k | £151.98k | £170.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | £59.02k | £22.60k | £51.80k | £21.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF CYCLING ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES. 2. TO ADVANCE AMATEUR SPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND SUPPORT FOR CYCLING SUCH AS THROUGH CYCLING TRAINING AND CYCLE MAINTENANCE TO MAKE BICYCLES SAFE TO RIDE. 3. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF BRADFORD IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS, AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY, THROUGH GROUP ACTIVITIES, VOLUNTEERING AND TRAINING IN CYCLING AND CYCLE MAINTENANCE. 4. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING CYCLING AND ACTIVE TRAVEL ACTIVITIES AND INFRASTRUCTURE AS ALTERNATIVES TO FOSSIL FUEL-BASED MODES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Capital of Cycling
Rawson Road
BRADFORD
BD1 3SH
- Phone:
- 01274309597
- Email:
- info@capitalofcycling.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window