FUREVER LOVED SMALL ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a non profit, foster based small animal rescue. Our aim is to help small animals in need in and around Keighley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Leeds City
Governance
- 14 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE KELLY | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Bullock | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATIE AUSTIN | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE STEPHENS | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.10k | £7.68k | £13.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.03k | £7.91k | £12.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2022 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2022 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 January 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS WITHIN THE WEST YORKSHIRE AREAS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE WEST YORKSHIRE AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Wignall Street
Keighley
BD20 6BG
- Phone:
- 07752549341
- Email:
- fureverloved@outlook.com
- Website:
-
fureverloved.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window