THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTERTON, THE GOOD SHEPHERD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable objects of the PCC are primarily focused on the advancement of religion, which is recognised as a charitable purpose having public benefit. All regular public worship is provided free of charge and open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £997 from 2 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 03 July 2018: Standard registration
- CHURCH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD, CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID JAMES MAHER | Chair | 10 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Arthur Tisdall | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Helen Buckley | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleonora Frida Scognamiglio | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Carnegie Innes | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Harvey Lamont | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Forbes | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Mary Lund | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Dawn Brewer | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Blows | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Susan Wingfield Pain | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kristian Sydney Hewett | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Phillips | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
GUIDO NICCOLO BARZINI | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JINTY NICOLA KEIR | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUTH BANGER | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.75k | £162.97k | £113.67k | £121.24k | £154.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.17k | £119.45k | £107.92k | £119.65k | £152.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | £2.42k | £1.00k | £997 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD
MANSEL WAY
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2ET
- Phone:
- 01223351844
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window