MELTON MOWBRAY COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 28 January 1982: Standard registration
- 24 January 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 24 January 2005: Funds transferred to 515573 VOLUNTEER CENTRE FOR THE BOROUGH OF MELTON
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 February 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 MAY 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FOR: (I) THE RELIEF OF AGED, INFIRM, SICK OR DISABLED PERSONS AND CHILDREN WITH SPECIFIC LEARNING DIFFICULTIES RESIDING WITHIN TEN MILES OF THE PARISH CHURCH AT MELTON MOWBRAY. (II) CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS SERVING THE AREA AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
WITHIN TEN MILES OF THE PARISH CHURCH AT MELTON MOWBRAY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window