LES PETITS BILINGUES DE NEWHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Les Petits Bilingues de Newham is the advancement of education for the public benefit by providing French-speaking and non-French-speaking children from the ages of 5 to 16 plus living in East London with lessons in French and other activities outside mainstream education to help those with an existing connection with the French language culture and heritage maintain it in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BURHANA TAJAMMAL | Chair | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MAYENAQUIBY | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shemaila RASHID | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.84k | £4.83k | £16.27k | £11.55k | £15.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.84k | £4.83k | £16.27k | £11.32k | £15.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2024 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2024 | 220 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2024 | 566 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2024 | 585 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2024 | 924 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2024 | 950 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF LES PETITS BILINGUES DE NEWHAM IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FRENCH SPEAKING AND NON-FRENCH SPEAKING CHILDREN FROM THE AGES OF 5 TO 16+ LIVING IN EAST LONDON WITH LESSONS IN FRENCH AND OTHER ACTIVITIES OUTSIDE MAINSTREAM EDUCATION TO HELP: (A) THOSE WITH AN EXISTING CONNECTION WITH FRENCH LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE MAINTAIN THIS CONNECTION IN THE UK AND WITH THEIR EXTENDED FAMILIES IN THEIR COUNTRIES OF ORIGIN; (B) THOSE WITH NO SUCH CONNECTION, ACQUIRE AN UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF FRENCH LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; (C) BINATIONAL FAMILIES WHO ARE EITHER SETTLED PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN EAST LONDON AND WHOSE CHILDREN DO NOT ATTEND FRENCH EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS MEET THEIR NEEDS AND VALUES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FRENCH CULTURAL SUPPORT WITH A FOCUS ON IMPROVING THE CHILDREN'S LANGUAGE SKILLS, CONFIDENCE AND SELF-ESTEEM, WHICH IN TURN WILL HAVE A FURTHER POSITIVE IMPACT ON THEIR LITERACY AND SPEAKING SKILLS; (D) CHILDREN ATTENDING OUR SCHOOL WITH THE ABILITY TO TRAVEL TO FRANCOPHONE COUNTRIES TO FURTHER EXPAND THEIR EXPOSURE TO AND IMMERSION INTO FRENCH LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND HERITAGE WHICH IN TURN LENDS TO A MORE POSITIVE INTEGRATION INTO BRITISH SOCIETY AND EDUCATIONAL SYSTEM; (E) PARENTS AND CHILDREN OF NEWHAM EAGER TO DEVELOP SUCH SKILLS EASILY ACCESS SUCH LANGUAGE LEARNING FACILITIES WITHOUT HAVING TO TRAVEL LONG DISTANCE; (F) EXTEND THE SERVICE TO ADULTS LIVING IN THE BOROUGH TO LEARN FRENCH LANGUAGE AND CULTURE; (G) ACHIEVE THESE PURPOSES BY THE USE OF NON-TRADITIONAL AND PLAYFUL TEACHING METHODS AIMING AT CREATING AN ATMOSPHERE OF FUN, ENGAGING STUDENTSÆ CREATIVITY IN THEIR LEARNING AND PRACTICE OF FRENCH LANGUAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Wharf Community Dock
2 John Harrison Square
LONDON
E16 2ZA
- Phone:
- 07470702474
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window