KINGS SCHOOL, GRANTHAM

Charity Number: 512256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charitable organisation holding the land and buildings used by the King's School, Grantham

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,768
Total expenditure: £1,826

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Joseph Ross Chair 16 October 2013
None on record
Matthew Wynn Mr Trustee 07 May 2024
None on record
Dr Holly Carter Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Daniel Chard Trustee 05 December 2017
None on record
JOSEPH HOWARD PELL Trustee
None on record
JEFFREY RICHARD THOMPSON Trustee
None on record
DAVID JOHN ARMES Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN COUSINS Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH ANN ALLISON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.21k £7.62k £8.07k £9.24k £9.77k
Total expenditure £11.34k £1.05k £1.34k £2.32k £1.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 August 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 FEBRUARY 1928 AND SCHEME OF 2 JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME IN PROMOTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT THE HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION, IN THE SUBJECTS OF MATHEMATICS AND PHYSICAL SCIENCE OR BOTH, OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO HAVE ATTENDED THE SCHOOL AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 April 1982 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE KINGS SCHOOL
BROOK STREET
GRANTHAM
NG31 6RP
Phone:
01476 563180
Website:

No information available