UNLOCK THE MUSIC CONCERT MAKING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a music based charity based in the Coventry. We work with amateur musicians of all ages, particularly singers to help them develop their talents by providing them with opportunities to perform in public. Often our charity raises much needed funds for other charities by setting up a concert typically in settings such as church halls or retirement homes to raise much needed funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- UMCM (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359 | £359 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £478 | £478 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 16 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 January 2022 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 January 2022 | 158 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1. THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS. 2. THE MAKING OF GRANTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window