HEXHAM ABBEY HERITAGE DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1179070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity raises funds to support the care and maintenance of Hexham Abbey and promote learning and engagement in its heritage, history and traditions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £115
Total expenditure: £282

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Charles Glover Trustee 06 May 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEXHAM ABBEY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ABBEY MUSIC
Received: On time
CHURCH AND COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP (TYNEDALE)
Received: On time
ANTHONY JONATHAN HEWITT Trustee 05 July 2018
FRIENDS OF ABBEY MUSIC
Received: On time
LINDISFARNE COLLEGE OF THEOLOGY LTD
Received: On time
RICHARD THORNTON Trustee 05 July 2018
HEXHAM ABBEY RESTORATION TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £150 £0 £0 £43.16k £115
Total expenditure £0 £65 £30 £16.02k £282
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HEXHAM ABBEY
ABBEY COTTAGE
BEAUMONT STREET
HEXHAM
NE46 3NB
Phone:
01434602031
Website:

No information available