Haddon Charity For Performing Arts

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Haddon Charity for Performing Arts (formerly known as HCPA) core mission is to tackle the barriers deprivation creates using Performing Arts as the tool to achieve this. HCPA runs weekly activities and supports a wide variety of children and young people specialising in SEN children and children with mental health needs. Our activities include all areas of Performing Arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 18 December 2018: CIO registration
- Haddon Charity of Performing Arts (Previous name)
- OUTREACH AND COMMUNITY ACTION PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA HADDON | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marie Bayliss | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Senter | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.86k | £95.06k | £76.06k | £85.10k | £68.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.37k | £80.30k | £57.21k | £100.52k | £86.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £900 | £14.50k | £400 | £1.50k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Dec 2018 as amended on 29 Aug 2022 as amended on 23 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE PERFORMING ARTS (DRAMA, MUSIC AND DANCE) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CLASSES, WORKSHOPS AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN ARTISTIC PERFORMANCES. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The former United Reform Church
HCPA Studios
73 Coleshill Road
CHAPEL END
NUNEATON
CV10 0NZ
- Phone:
- 07454979648
- Email:
- hspaocap@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window