CHRONIC LYMPHOCYTIC LEUKAEMIA SUPPORT ASSOCIATION UK(CLLSA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to inform, support and empower chronic lymphocytic leukaemia patients in the UK, together with their carers, families and friends
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 May 2018: CIO registration
- 24 July 2023: Funds received from 1113588 CHRONIC LYMPHOCYTIC LEUKAEMIA SUPPORT ASSOCIATION ...
- CHRONIC LYMPHOCYTIC LEUKAEMIA SUPPORT ASSOCIATION (CLLSA) (Previous name)
- CHRONIC LYMPHOCYTIC LEUKAEMIA SUPPORT ASSOCIATION UK(CLLSA UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hilary Frances Lindsay | Chair | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Allen | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debra Yates | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Holland | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Greensmyth | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norah Grant | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £339.68k | £90.23k | £154.59k | £141.82k | £116.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.94k | £91.92k | £76.73k | £87.30k | £217.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 May 2018 as amended on 22 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO CHRONIC LYMPHOCYTIC LEUKAEMIA (CLL) PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS (CLL INCLUDES SIMILAR RELATED CONDITIONS E.G. SLL ETC.) 2. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN CLL RELATED MATTERS PRIMARILY IN THE UK THROUGH PUBLICATIONS AND THE INTERNET. 3. TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF ALL CLL PATIENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 112
8 The Bridge
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN15 1FY
- Phone:
- 08009774396
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window