Trustees THE MAYOR OF WOLVERHAMPTON'S CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1180065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Linda Mary Mason aka Leach Chair 17 May 2023
None on record
Councillor Craig John Collingswood Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
James Howse Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Dr Michael Hardacre Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
TRACEY JOANNA CHRISTIE Trustee 04 April 2018
None on record