THE SHINE FOR SHANI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 To improve the health and life chances of children with heart conditions, primarily by research into paediatric cardiology. 2 Any other purposes as shall for the time being be charitable according to the laws of England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY RUSSELL JAYSON | Chair | 29 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
Avner Aryeh Radomsky | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JULIET RUTH BERMAN | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JUDITH FRIEDMAN | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DAREN GORDON | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr SIMON LEWIS BERMAN | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.69k | £50.25k | £69.30k | £50.68k | £84.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.37k | £63.05k | £74.14k | £40.37k | £61.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH AND LIFE-CHANCES OF CHILDREN WITH HEART CONDITIONS, PRIMARILY BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO PAEDIATRIC CARDIOLOGY (2) ANY OTHER PURPOSES (WHETHER EFFECTED OR TO BE EFFECTED) AS SHALL FOR THE TIME BEING BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jayson Business Consulting Ltd
32 Hampstead High Street
LONDON
NW3 1QD
- Phone:
- 02073178980
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window