THE SWINTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Womens Institute, abiding by the rules and constitution of the National Federation of the Womens Institute. We hold monthly meetings, we engage in social events, educational trips and activities. We fundraise and socialise together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 August 2018: Standard registration
- SWINTON WI (Working name)
- SWINTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAYLEY DELL | Chair | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
cheryl talbot | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIA ROSARIA BURKE | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL DRUGGAN | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE WALLACE | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.39k | £4.55k | £4.16k | £5.59k | £9.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.84k | £1.63k | £3.28k | £5.09k | £8.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE WI ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BATSMANS DRIVE
CLIFTON
SWINTON
MANCHESTER
M27 6LB
- Phone:
- 07795522897
- Email:
- mariabur@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window