WE ARE STRONGER CHARITY

Charity Number: 1181286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of anti-bullying programmes and one to one counselling sessions. Raising awareness and understanding of the effects of bullying.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 20 December 2024

Total income: £1,948
Total expenditure: £2,344

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 December 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OLGA VENOSA Chair 29 May 2017
None on record
Neil de Mello Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Ilaria Emanuelle Bianchi Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/12/2020 20/12/2021 20/12/2022 20/12/2023 20/12/2024
Total gross income £4.91k £14.66k £13.42k £9.08k £1.95k
Total expenditure £8.01k £10.50k £16.66k £11.27k £2.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 December 2024 02 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2024 02 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2023 15 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2022 19 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2021 02 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2020 31 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CAPITAL OFFICE
124 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
Phone:
07717576647