Accounts and annual returns BEZA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1181281
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2025 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 April 2023 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window