Trustees FRIENDS OF NUNHEAD CEMETERY
Charity number: 1178763

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY PARTINGTON | Chair | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Petra Florina Handoca | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE PHILIP HARRINGTON WARNER | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES NEWMAN | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER SEWAL PANE LOMER | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
GARRY ROY WILES | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEITH TURPIN | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
RONALD WOOLLACOTT MBE | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MARGARET STEVENSON | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN COLEY | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY HART OBE | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE CHRISTINE HART FICHEME | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.