ZICHRON REUVEN AHARON LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Jewish faith in particular but not exclusively by maintaining and managing a Synagogue as a a place of worship and study and by providing for the religious and pastoral needs of the members and community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 28 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shlomie Mordechai Rokach | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Gavriel Rokach | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Moishe Royde | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.92k | £7.23k | £11.75k | £54.16k | £45.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.49k | £3.21k | £14.49k | £24.96k | £36.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ESTABLISHING MAINTAINING AND MANAGING A SYNAGOGUE IN EDGWARE AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR PUBLIC PRAYER AND RELIGIOUS STUDY AND BY PROVIDING FOR THE RELIGIOUS NEEDS, SPIRITUAL EDUCATION, PASTORAL NEEDS AND WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS AND OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL JEWISH COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Wolmer Gardens
EDGWARE
Middlesex
HA8 8QD
- Phone:
- 07921682267
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window