LOOE LIONS CLUB

Charity number: 1179335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Lions Club of Looe organises numerous public fundraising activities (such as car boot sales and lotteries), public participation activities (such as Carnival Week, Easter egg hunt and the arrival of Father Christmas) at which funds are also raised and also activities that are purely organised for the benefit and enjoyment of others (such as seniors Chritmas parties).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £35,952
Total expenditure: £39,052

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 July 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • LIONS CLUB OF LOOE (Working name)
  • LOOE LIONS CLUB (CIO) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER JOHN KINGHAM Chair 10 October 2018
None on record
Guy Quint Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Samual James Tanner Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Eileen Holford Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
PHILLIP GIBSON Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
ANDREW JEREMY FRENCH Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
NIGEL JOHN WHITE Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
CAROLE LESLEY WHITE Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
HEDLEY JOHN MARTIN Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.11k £2.42k £28.18k £25.07k £35.95k
Total expenditure £22.22k £4.48k £11.18k £29.78k £39.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 02 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 11 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE OLD BARN
POLPERRO ROAD
LOOE
PL13 2JS
Phone:
08458336719
Website:

looelions.co.uk