NEWLIFE CHURCH, PALMERS GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newlife Church is a local, evangelical, charismatic Christian church based in the former Baptist Chapel on Green Lanes in Palmers Green. We gather for worship, Bible teaching, prayer, English teaching, helping the homeless (with other local churches) and reaching out with the Good News of Jesus Christ, principally in Palmers Green but also in a wider area as opportunities arise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
Governance
- 15 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madhu Amrutha Raju Udu | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Rawding | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW RAWDING | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bruce David McGill | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ROBERT SHEARER | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP KINGHAM | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MARY KINGHAM | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.74k | £121.19k | £113.05k | £142.64k | £190.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.42k | £88.05k | £107.72k | £162.16k | £173.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 4.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND 4.2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, UNEMPLOYMENT, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR WHO ARE VICTIMS OF WAR, NATURAL DISASTER OR ANY OTHER CATASTROPHE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWLIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Palmers Green Baptist Church
211 Green Lanes
LONDON
N13 4UH
- Phone:
- 02082457219
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window