HOLT & DISTRICT DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Centred on Holt and the surrounding district, we offer social support and access to activities for those living with dementia and respite for their carers through provision of 2 weekly cafes, a home visiting service and a twice monthly afternoon cafe, plus information and advice on our website and newsletters, dementia awareness training and participation in local dementia friendly initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE GAYNOR ROBERTS | Chair | 04 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Jocelyn Paula Wiggins | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen John Gillam | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL MARGARET HORSLEY | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR MARY SIDGWICK | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BENSON TWINING SIDGWICK | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.42k | £3.20k | £16.08k | £16.89k | £9.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.06k | £3.13k | £7.17k | £9.02k | £11.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.23k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Sep 2018 as amended on 18 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS WITHIN HOLT AND THE IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING DISTRICT TO A RADIUS OF 8 MILES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR DISABILITY BY:- 1. PROVIDING SUPPORT AND SERVICES APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEEDS; 2. DEVELOPING GREATER AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF DEMENTIA ISSUES WITHIN OUR LOCAL COMMUNITY; 3. ESTABLISHING AND DEVELOPING NETWORKS AND LINKS WITH OTHER SERVICE PROVIDERS AND BUSINESSES TO ENABLE US TO SUPPORT AND DEVELOP A LOCAL DEMENTIA FRIENDLY COMMUNITY; 4. PROVIDING ACCESSIBLE INFORMATION ON HOW TO ACCESS ADVICE, SUPPORT AND SERVICES FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS; AND 5. PROVIDING SOCIAL SUPPORT AND ACCESS TO ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A DEMENTIA-FRIENDLY CAFÉ, HOME VISITING AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Cromer Road
HOLT
Norfolk
NR25 6EU
- Phone:
- 01263710617
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window