ENVIRONMENTAL FUNDERS NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EFN brings together trusts, foundations, family offices and individual donors. Our activities take place in the UK and include convening, research, publications and newsletters to foster more effective environmental philanthropy and encourage more support for environmental causes. Separately, we convene fundraisers and others in the sector to help them collaborate and learn from one another.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£714,393
Donations and legacies | £586.68k | |
Charitable activities | £127.72k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£621,250
Raising funds | £12.91k | |
Charitable activities | £608.34k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £12.91k | |
Charitable expenditure | £608.34k | |
Retained for future use | £93.14k |
People

8 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Hilary Gadd | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ian Elliott | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Elizabeth Erdman | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Addington | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eva Rehse | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Mehta | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Almyrie Napier | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE SUSAN BRYAN | Trustee | 21 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.39k | £367.21k | £519.39k | £541.64k | £714.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.64k | £253.53k | £442.71k | £473.60k | £621.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £499.74k | £471.69k | £586.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £19.65k | £69.94k | £127.72k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £434.53k | £462.50k | £608.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £8.18k | £11.09k | £12.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £14.77k | £23.57k | £18.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £1.02k | £357 | £797 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £447.58k | £504.02k | £634.66k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £40.49k | £28.23k | £66.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2018 as amended on 06 Jul 2020 as amended on 19 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE BODIES IN THE ENVIRONMENTAL SECTOR, BEING THE PART OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR CONCERNED WITH THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) LIAISING WITH, RESEARCHING AND ACTING AS A FORUM FOR THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION BETWEEN, ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN THE ENVIRONMENTAL SECTOR, IN ORDER TO IDENTIFY HOW THE SECTOR MIGHT BETTER ACHIEVE CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO IDENTIFYING FUNDING GAPS AND GAPS IN SERVICE PROVISION IN THE SECTOR; (B) PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO EXISTING AND POTENTIAL FUNDERS OF CHARITIES AND NON CHARITABLE BODIES WORKING IN THE ENVIRONMENTAL SECTOR TO ENCOURAGE THEM TO INCREASE THEIR FUNDING AND TO PROVIDE FUNDING IN A WAY WHICH INCREASES THE EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF FUNDING FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY THE ENVIRONMENTAL SECTOR; (C) PROVIDING CHARITIES WORKING IN THE ENVIRONMENTAL SECTOR WITH STRATEGIC AND FUNDRAISING ADVICE; AND (E) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Environmental Funders Network
124 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07538593527
- Email:
- info@greenfunders.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window