Financial history CANTELUPE CENTRE

Charity number: 512294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.06k £39.54k £33.24k £33.71k £33.19k
Total expenditure £40.12k £27.08k £14.28k £29.99k £22.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A