CANTELUPE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre is situated on the Market Place, Ilkeston, Derbyshire. The Centre is accessible to large parts of the community, at present we currently have approx 700 visitors per week to the centre. They attend different groups for example:- Before & after school club, Pre School Playgroup, Holiday Club, Mental Health groups, Youth Club, Coffee Bars & Market Research groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 July 1982: Standard registration
- THE CANTELUPE CENTRE (Working name)
- ILKESTON ST MARY'S YOUTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaun Michael Manchester | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew James Baguley | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Edith Attenborough | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANN WING | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.06k | £39.54k | £33.24k | £33.71k | £33.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.12k | £27.08k | £14.28k | £29.99k | £22.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 01/07/1971 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2012
Charitable objects
FOR A YOUTH CENTRE FOR YOUNG PERSONS RESIDING IN OR NEAR PARISH OF ILKESTON FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION USE ON FIVE EVENINGS PER WEEK, AT LEAST TWO BEING WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. ALSO FOR CHURCH PURPOSES AS CLAUSE 5.
Area of benefit
ILKESTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cantelupe Centre
Market Place
ILKESTON
Derbyshire
DE7 5HY
- Phone:
- 01159321329
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window