FARM URBAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We undertake research in and to advance the education of the public in the protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment by the promotion of sustainable development of urban food production and promote for the benefit of the public, the protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment by the sustainable development techniques for urban food production.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Flintshire
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 24 May 2019: CIO registration
- Farm Urban Educational Trust (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDER PROBYN | Chair | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MATTHEW LEE MURPHY | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENS MAX HAYDN THOMAS | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PAUL LLOYD | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £41.81k | £0 | £0 | £50.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £40.27k | £0 | £0 | £44.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DEVELOPMENT AND IMPLEMENTATION OF EFFICIENT TECHNOLOGY OF FARMING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS IN THE SCIENCE OF URBAN FOOD PRODUCTION AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH IN RELATED SUBJECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 WORDSWORTH STREET
LIVERPOOL
L8 0RR
- Phone:
- 07581177969
- Email:
- info@farmurbantrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window