POCKLINGTON AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Club's activities in the Pocklington and Market Weighton area of East Yorkshire are focussed on raising funds to achieve our objectives. We provide and maintain a fleet of mobility scooters and wheelchairs enabling disabled and elderly members of the community to keep their mobility and improve their independence. in addition grants are given to individuals for their welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HARRISON | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham West | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Riley | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Geoffrey Finn | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Riley | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|||||
John Lincoln Eeles | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Wilks | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.92k | £10.89k | £26.37k | £16.68k | £13.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.46k | £8.98k | £14.98k | £20.74k | £14.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: 1.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY: 1.1.1.1 PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; 1.1.1.2 ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; 1.1.1.3 PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; 1.1.1.4 ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; 1.1.1.5 SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 1.1.2 PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; 1.1.3 PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; 1.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; 1.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; 1.1.6 PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR 1.1.7 PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 STROTHER CLOSE
POCKLINGTON
YORK
YO42 2GR
- Phone:
- 01759 305490
- Email:
- john.eeles@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window