SUDANESE COMMUNITY IN BRADFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY DOES THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR CHILDRENS AND ADULTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Musa Elnour | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Osman Ahmed | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Hassan Osman | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Osman Yagoob | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amera Mohamad | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
LILA MENGWAY | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.60k | £16.05k | £14.63k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.25k | £7.33k | £4.46k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 68 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 433 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 165 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY IN THE CITY OF BRADFORD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE. 2) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS AND COMMUNITIES OF THE CITY OF BRADFORD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS, IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUACKER MEETING HOUSE
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
C/O Bradford African Community
BD5 0JB
- Phone:
- 07490026037
- Email:
- ishaqyounis33@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window