HELP A SQUADDIE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help Veterans get back on their by providing homeless Veterans a stable home at The Russell Aston Home For Veterans and provide any further support they may need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 18 March 2019: CIO registration
- 30 August 2019: Funds received from 1149579 SAVE OUR SOLDIER
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Urquhart | Chair | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Craig Barrington | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Ryan Mr | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mike Aston Mr | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR A FESSEY | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.53k | £37.41k | £77.10k | £386.91k | £96.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.18k | £29.30k | £55.96k | £376.95k | £84.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.00k | £5.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EX-MILITARY SERVICES PERSONNEL AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A DROP IN FACILITY AND OTHER SERVICES TO MEET THEIR NEEDS AND CAPABILITIES AND HELP THEM ADAPT TO LIFE OUTSIDE THE ARMED FORCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Church
Hednesford Road
Heath Hayes
CANNOCK
Staffordshire
WS12 3DZ
- Phone:
- 03003651332
- Email:
- admin@helpasquaddie.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window