CYLCH MEITHRIN PENPARC

Charity number: 1178816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Ysgol feithrin

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £95,675
Total expenditure: £83,347

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 2018: CIO registration
  • 06 December 2018: Funds received from 1056905 CYLCH MEITHRIN PENPARC
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • GRWP MEITHRIN PENPARC (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MIRIAM ELERI DAVIES Chair 01 June 2017
None on record
Naomi Sharp Trustee 17 August 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.17k £62.69k £88.92k £97.80k £95.68k
Total expenditure £48.82k £58.62k £63.18k £65.85k £83.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £36.59k £32.82k
Income from government grants £26.09k £28.10k £44.90k £53.23k £48.43k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 September 2024 233 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 September 2024 233 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 March 2023 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Y caban
Iard yr ysgol
Penparc
Aberteifi
Ceredigion
SA43 1SG
Phone:
01239810343
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available