Financial history NEPALI CHRISTIAN CHURCHES UK (NCCUK)

Charity number: 1179062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £84.43k £51.43k £59.98k £76.32k £65.02k
Total expenditure £66.34k £47.68k £57.15k £76.00k £63.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A