BOLTON ARMED FORCES CENTRE 4 VETERANS CIO

Charity number: 1183103
Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bolton Armed Forces Centre 4 Veterans CIO Our aim is to provide a point of reference for members and former members and their families of all branches of the armed forces who need help and advice no matter what the issue is, from housing and benefits to Someone to talk to about any other problems That may occur. The centre is run by veterans who understand the problems veterans face

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £16,392
Total expenditure: £10,415

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RYAN JONES Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
BARRY PICKARD Trustee 04 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.75k £16.39k
Total expenditure £18.97k £10.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 November 2020 26 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Victory Centre
Victory street
BL1 4JA
Phone:
01204776628