Financial history COMBONI MISSIONARY SISTERS CIO

Charity number: 1179823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £153.35k £183.63k £168.88k £199.88k £243.97k
Total expenditure £226.52k £174.60k £167.01k £261.99k £307.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A