BARTON-IN-THE BEANS COMMUNITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we have not been active during the last 12 months
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 04 February 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHLEY PETER GARRATT | Trustee | 27 November 1995 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NOEL JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIFFORD ROGER JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38 | £45 | £9 | £7 | £54 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £3 | £1.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7 DECEMBER 1981.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BARTON IN THE BEANS IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS, OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT:- (A) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR; (B) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (C) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION. (D) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
BARTON IN THE BEANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 West End
Barton In The Beans
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV13 0DG
- Phone:
- 07940365810
- Email:
- apgarratt@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window