SHAKESPEARE SOUTHAMPTON LEGACY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and heritage preservation, through the appreciation and study of the life and times of the Wriothesley Earls of Southampton (1505-1667), including their collateral descent, with added reference to the advancement of Shakespearean knowledge as it relates to Henry Wriothesley, 3rd Earl of Southampton, William Shakespeare's sole dedicatee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 August 2019: Standard registration
- SSLT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ralph Douglas-Scott Montagu | Chair | 24 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN WILTON-SMITH | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Kay Matthias | Trustee | 24 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dorna Louise Bewley M.A. | Trustee | 24 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.10k | £14.79k | £37.51k | £31.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53k | £17.66k | £13.64k | £59.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, THROUGH THE APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE LIFE AND TIMES OF THE WRIOTHESLEY, EARLS OF SOUTHAMPTON (1505-1667), INCLUDING THEIR COLLATERAL DESCENT, WITH ADDED REFERENCE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF SHAKESPEAREAN KNOWLEDGE AS IT RELATES TO HENRY WRIOTHESLEY, 3RD EARL OF SOUTHAMPTON (1573-1624), WILLIAM SHAKESPEARE’S SOLE DEDICATEE; INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY • ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING, AN ONLINE REPOSITORY OF BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, RECORDS OF HISTORIC INTEREST, PICTURES, PHOTOGRAPHS, AND OBJECTS OF ANTIQUITY • SPONSORING, HOSTING, AND CONTRIBUTING TO CONFERENCES, LECTURES AND COMMEMORATION EVENTS BRINGING TOGETHER INDIVIDUAL RESEARCHERS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WORLDWIDE • PROMOTING, PRODUCING AND SUPPORTING INFORMATION MEDIA SUCH AS THE INTERNET, RADIO, TELEVISION, LIBRARIES, UNIVERSITY PRESSES, SEMINARS, CONFERENCES, LECTURES AND EXHIBITIONS • DEVELOPING, SUPPORTING, AND MAKING RESEARCH SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, AND GRANTS 2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE HISTORIC GRADE 1 LISTED BUILDING KNOWN AS ST PETER’S PARISH CHURCH TITCHFIELD, HAMPSHIRE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE CHAPEL, MONUMENTS, AND SUBTERRANEAN SEPULCHRE OF THE WRIOTHESLEY, EARLS OF SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
PALACE HOUSE
BEAULIEU
BROCKENHURST
SO42 7YL
- Phone:
- 001590614705
- Email:
- sslt@beaulieu.co.uk
- Website:
-
shakespearesouthamptonlegacytrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window