THE GARDEN HOUSE (MARPLE) CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are The Garden House, an urban farm situated in Marple. Our aim is to provide families, trusts and educational establishments, including those with complex needs and those who are less abled, with an outdoor space in the Cheshire countryside, where people can come and learn about animal welfare and develop an appreciation of the wonderful and historic surroundings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 2019: Standard registration
- THE GARDEN HOUSE (MARPLE) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colette Boswell | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARK HANNON | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN SWINDELLS | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES BRYANT | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 29/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.07k | £43.17k | £128.12k | £183.32k | £97.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.58k | £56.08k | £129.63k | £76.92k | £108.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.82k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 December 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 23 December 2022 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 16 December 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 16 December 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 December 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PARTICULARLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SUBJECTS OF FARMING, INCLUDING ANIMAL WELFARE AND FOOD PRODUCTION; AND NATURE AND THE ENVIRONMENT; 2 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3 TO PRESERVE, RESTORE, MAINTAIN AND REPAIR SAMUEL OLDKNOW’S GARDEN HOUSE, MARPLE BEING OF HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL MERIT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THOSE FEATURES OF ITS HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT EXISTS IN AND AROUND THE SAID GARDEN HOUSE AND ITS PLACE WITHIN THE MELLOR MILL SITE. 4 TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Garden House
Lakes Road
Marple
Marple Ridge
STOCKPORT
SK6 7DH
- Phone:
- 01614278712
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window