Accounts and annual returns LITTLE PAWS FERRET RESCUE

Charity number: 1182331
Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 04 May 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 13 March 2025 347 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 11 April 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 11 April 2023 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 24 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window