LITTLE PAWS FERRET RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We will rescue abandoned, lost and unwanted ferrets from within Sunderland and South Tyneside. We will rehabilitate and care for these ferrets until they are able to be rehomed. We will carry out activities to find new homes for the ferrets in rescue and provide backup support for the lifetime of the ferret. We will promote neutering of pet ferrets to reduce the number of unwanted litters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 05 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vicki Hall | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jade Louise Gardiner | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Reuben James Gillett | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE BRUNTON | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.69k | £27.61k | £21.05k | £37.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.63k | £19.74k | £32.74k | £34.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 04 May 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 13 March 2025 | 347 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF FERRETS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A RESCUE HOME OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT AND RE-HOMING OF SUCH ANIMALS. B) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS FERRETS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR FERRETS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN FERRET WELFARE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 TAUNTON SQUARE
SUNDERLAND
SR3 4BD
- Phone:
- 07908610342
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window