MILTON KEYNES IAC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company is non profit organisation promoting Arts Heritage and Culture activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £55,650 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 23 May 2019: Standard registration
- MKIAC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGETTE GILLIAN CHILD | Chair | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chamberlain | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Zamarripa SOLIS | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Sindy Hayton | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANSAR BASIR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANOUAR KASSIM MBE | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAULA BALLARD B.A. | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £221.98k | £351.13k | £314.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £108.86k | £122.59k | £234.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.99k | £55.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 August 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 August 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 APR 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ART FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITH REFERENCE TO ISLAMIC ARTS THROUGH ENGAGEMENT AND PARTICIPATION OF THE ARTS THROUGH THE CREATION AND RUNNING OF A FESTIVAL AND OTHER RELATED EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 FOSSEY CLOSE
SHENLEY BROOK END
MILTON KEYNES
MK5 7FT
- Phone:
- 07981223541
- Email:
- info.MKIAC@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window