THE OAKLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To improve the lifestyle of adults with learning disabilities through their work/leisure-time activities so to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity, within their capabilities. 2 To provide and extend links between the community at large and people with learning disabilities. 3. To assist and encourage persons and organisations involved in t
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,326,628
Donations and legacies | £7.94k | |
Charitable activities | £1.29m | |
Other trading activities | £28.17k | |
Investments | £3.78k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,301,460
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.30m | |
Retained for future use | £25.17k |
People

45 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 April 1982: Standard registration
- THE WARSOP AND DISTRICT MENTALLY HANDICAPPED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN LUNN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sandra Cooper | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Cannings | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Poole | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Milnes | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Shooter | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA STOCKDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH NUTTALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PETER BIRCHENALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £986.70k | £1.04m | £1.10m | £1.13m | £1.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £963.42k | £948.91k | £1.06m | £1.20m | £1.30m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £43.39k | £29.46k | £500 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £21.18k | £22.89k | £30.17k | £19.71k | £7.94k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £13.59k | £2.08k | £11.57k | £22.44k | £28.17k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £951.07k | £967.74k | £1.03m | £1.09m | £1.29m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £862 | £611 | £108 | £667 | £3.78k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £43.39k | £29.46k | £500 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £963.42k | £948.91k | £1.06m | £1.20m | £1.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £600 | £4.50k | £4.50k | £6.30k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £159.50k | £123.95k | £117.26k | £115.46k | £103.79k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £527.23k | £638.76k | £702.99k | £623.76k | £655.69k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £42.07k | £30.24k | £39.89k | £30.19k | £25.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 1981 AS AMENDED 9 DECEMBER 1981, 10 MARCH 1982 AND 21 JUNE 1984. FURTHER AMENDED 28 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 1999. as amended on 25 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO IMPROVE THE LIFESTYLE OF THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS THROUGH THEIR WORK/LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY WITHIN THEIR CAPACITIES. 2. TO PROVIDE AND EXTEND LINKS BETWEEN THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE AND MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS.. 3. TO ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS INVOLVE IN THE SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE WARSOP AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Oakfield Avenue
Warsop
MANSFIELD
NG20 0LQ
- Phone:
- 07939050255
- Website:
-
oaklandscharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window