THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pershore Talking Newspaper produces, fortnightly, a recording on memory stick to blind persons and those with temporary or permanently impaired sight. It contains readings of news from in and around Pershore and an item of special interest or an interview with a local person. It also has a selection of articles from recent national magazines (with their permission).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 March 1982: Standard registration
- 17 September 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 September 2024: Funds transferred to 510219 VALE TALKING NEWS
- PERSHORE TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
- THE PERSHORE TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.36k | £1.08k | £627 | £2.80k | £520 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £976 | £1.47k | £1.25k | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/10/1981 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/1981 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, PARTIALLY-SIGHTED OR THOSE WHO HAVE DIFFICULTY READING BY THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION, ON A REGULAR BASIS, OF AN AUDIO RECORDING OF NEWS FROM IN AND AROUND PERSHORE (AND WHERE NECESSARY PROVIDE THE MEANS OF PLAYING THE RECORDING).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window