Financial history THE SIMMS REEVE INSTITUTE BRANCASTER

Charity Number: 1180739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £379.65k £56.53k £99.98k £111.46k £125.03k
Total expenditure £70.89k £67.25k £108.10k £123.59k £142.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.71k £12.23k £1.50k N/A