IMANI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular self protection, self preservation sessions for adults, parents and children, covering anger management, stress management techniques, anti-bullying and anti-violence strategy; healing mechanism. "Food for Though Programme"-train young people and their family helping them to build up self-confidence and asertiveness and provide food for participants. Forging relationship with other groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 09 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVILLE EFFE ORMSBY | Chair | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
NOEL NEWTON MORGAN | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARLENE WRAY | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £502 | £157 | £750 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £13.03k | £919 | £1.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 273 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MANCHESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BUT ALSO FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE UK AND OTHER COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
IMANI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
51 COWESBY STREET
MANCHESTER
M14 4UQ
- Phone:
- 07973157604
- Email:
- jodhh@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window