CITY ARTS NEWBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to promote, maintain, improve and advance education and appreciation of the arts in all forms in West Berkshire and the surrounding areas. To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, assist them to integrate into and contribute to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 07 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Caroline Frances Grace Samuel | Chair | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Colberg Goldsmith | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Willis | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Winifred Long | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHARON JOHNSON | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.59k | £21.05k | £35.44k | £60.10k | £74.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.42k | £29.59k | £36.23k | £54.39k | £89.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £16.91k | N/A | £900 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 26 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN ALL FORMS AMONG THE PEOPLE OF WEST BERKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY ARTS HUB. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO AND CONTRIBUTE TO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COHESIVE COMMUNITY ARTS EVENTS, VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES AND OTHER SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR YOUTH OR OLD AGE, DISABILITY, POOR EDUCATION OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT, OR AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED GROUP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Hampton Road
Newbury
RG14 6DB
- Phone:
- 01635 242536
- Email:
- info@cityartsnewbury.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window