TALIA E LA VALIGIA DELLE IDEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities consist with the education of the public in general in relation to Italian language and culture, including but not limited to literature, music, theatre and cooking, particularly but not exclusively by organising and running playgroups, workshops and other events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- India
- Italy
Governance
- 04 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELEONORA GIOVANNARDI | Chair | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARA MARCHESI | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE TARRONI | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.24k | £4.36k | £15.20k | £23.60k | £19.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.46k | £3.10k | £15.46k | £23.73k | £19.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 DEC 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS OR GUARDIANS LIVING IN LONDON) IN RELATION TO ITALIAN LANGUAGE AND CULTURE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO LITERATURE, MUSIC, THEATRE AND COOKING, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ORGANISING AND RUNNING PLAYGROUPS, WORKSHOPS AND OTHER EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 18.9
Exhibition House
Addison Bridge Place
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07462933295
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
under construction - our facebook page is Taliaelavaligiadelleidee
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window