NEPAL YOUTH FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer hope and opportunity to Nepal's most disadvantaged children by providing them with what is every child's birth right - vital healthcare, education and a nurturing home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nepal
Governance
- 28 February 2019: CIO registration
- NYF (Working name)
- NYF-UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Gina Parker | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
INA SKAR BEESTON | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John Russell | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|||||||
SIMON RUSSELL | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £596.04k | £116.85k | £74.79k | £207.10k | £272.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £624.89k | £136.13k | £18.52k | £239.42k | £300.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £585.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £10.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £531.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £74.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN NEPAL BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: • ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; • ADVANCING EDUCATION; • PROVISION OF NUTRITION CENTRES TO RESTORE THE HEALTH OF SEVERELY MALNOURISHED CHILDREN AND TO EDUCATE THE CHILD’S CARER ON HEALTH, HYGIENE AND NUTRITION TO STOP THE CYCLE OF MALNUTRITION; • PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL CARE FOR DESTITUTE CHILDREN WHERE THERE IS NO FAMILY ALTERNATIVE AVAILABLE; • RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stanwick Hall
Higham Road
Stanwick
Wellingborough
NN9 6QE
- Phone:
- 01933626478
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window