SCHOOL SISTERS OF NOTRE DAME CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO supports the four members of the School Sisters of Notre Dame who live and minister in England. Two of these are located in Merseyside and two and London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 August 2018: CIO registration
- 20 June 2019: Funds received from 221045 SCHOOL SISTERS OF NOTRE DAME
- SSND (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SISTER MARGARET PATRICIA MCPHEE | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SISTER ANNE ELIZABETH BRUDER | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sister EILEEN MARY DONOHOE | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.60k | £177.49k | £147.45k | £47.99k | £30.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.38k | £156.86k | £238.94k | £135.96k | £124.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hays Mac Llp
Thames Exchange
10 Queen Street Place
LONDON
EC4R 1AG
- Phone:
- 02076965500
- Email:
- ssnd27@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window